WV SB490 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB490

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-07 - Approved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to protection of animal and crop facilities

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to criminal offenses against agricultural facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 477) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 509) (Y: 83 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 154) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-07HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/20
2020-03-07HouseTo Governor 3/17/20 - House Journal
2020-03-07SenateTo Governor 3/17/20 - Senate Journal
2020-03-17SenateTo Governor 3/17/20
2020-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2020-03-06SenateCompleted legislative action
2020-03-06SenateCommunicated to House
2020-03-06SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 477)
2020-03-06SenateSenate concurred in House title amendment (Voice vote)
2020-03-06SenateHouse Message received
2020-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2020-03-04HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 509)
2020-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-04HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-03HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2020-03-02HouseRead 1st time
2020-03-02HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2020-02-29HouseDo pass
2020-02-24HouseTo House Judiciary
2020-02-24HouseDo pass, but first to Judiciary
2020-02-18HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2020-02-18HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
2020-02-18HouseIntroduced in House
2020-02-17SenateOrdered to House
2020-02-17SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 154)
2020-02-17SenateRead 3rd time
2020-02-17SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-02-14SenateFloor amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2020-02-14SenateHaving been read 2nd time 2/13/20
2020-02-13SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/13/20
2020-02-13SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-12SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/12/20
2020-02-11SenateLaid over on 2nd reading 2/11/20
2020-02-11SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-02-10SenateRead 1st time
2020-02-10SenateOn 1st reading
2020-02-07SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2020-01-23SenateTo Judiciary
2020-01-23SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2020-01-15SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2020-01-15SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-15SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Judiciary
2020-01-15SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB4169 (Similar To) 2020-01-14 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
SB490 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - To Finance

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
613B7New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=490&year=2020&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB490%20INTR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=490
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB490%20SUB1.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=490
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB490%20SUB2.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=490
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB490%20SUB2%20ENG.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=490
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB490%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2020&sesstype=RS&i=490
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/02-17-0154.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/house/00509.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2020/RS/votes/senate/03-06-0477.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback