WV SB487 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-14 - Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing exception that all DNR payments be deposited within 24 hours
Title
Providing exception that all DNR payments be deposited within 24 hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 139) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 32) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 32) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 229, Acts, Regular Session, 2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Approved by Governor 2/24/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/24/20 |
2020-02-19 | House | To Governor 2/18/20 - House Journal |
2020-02-19 | Senate | To Governor 2/18/20 - Senate Journal |
2020-02-18 | Senate | To Governor 2/18/20 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2020-02-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2020-02-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 139) |
2020-02-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-02-11 | House | From House Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2020-02-11 | House | On 3rd reading, House Calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | From Special Calendar, 3rd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2020-02-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-02-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2020-02-05 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Do pass |
2020-01-28 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 32) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-01-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2020-01-15 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2020-01-15 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4507 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |