WV SB485 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Terminating Workers Compensation Debt Reduction Fund assessment on self-insured employers
Title
Terminating Workers Compensation Debt Reduction Fund assessment on self-insured employers
Sponsors
Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 241) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | To Finance |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 241) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2018-02-05 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-05 | Senate | To Finance |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4628 (Similar To) 2018-04-17 - Chapter 247, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 2C | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |