WV SB480 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to DEP Office of Oil and Gas
Title
Relating to DEP Office of Oil and Gas
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 164) (Y: 25 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-22 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 164) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-25 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-25 | Senate | To Energy, Industry, and Mining then Finance |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 6 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 6 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |