WV SB474 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-04 - Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to codify the learned intermediary doctrine, which recognizes: (1) That prescribing physicians are in a superior position to impart drug warning to patients and provide independent medical decisions as to whether use of the drug is appropriate for treatment of a particular patient; (2) That drug manufacturers lack effective means to communicate directly with each patient; and (3) That imposing a duty to warn upon drug manufacturers would unduly interfere with the physician-patient relationship. This section is new; therefore, strike-throughs and underscoring have been omitted.
Title
Relating to nonresident liability claims for prescription drug warnings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-12 - House - Effect July 1, 2011 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-12 - House - Passage (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Chapter 1, Acts, Regular Session, 2011 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 | |
2011-03-18 | Approved by Governor 4/4/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/29/11 - House Journal | |
2011-03-18 | To Governor 3/29/11 - Senate Journal | |
2011-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/11 | |
2011-03-12 | Completed legislative action | |
2011-03-12 | House Message received | |
2011-03-12 | Communicated to Senate | |
2011-03-12 | Effective July 1, 2011 (Roll No. 397) | |
2011-03-12 | Passed House (Roll No. 396) | |
2011-03-12 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-12 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-11 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2011-03-10 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2011-03-09 | Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | To House Judiciary | |
2011-03-01 | Do pass, but first to Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2011-02-23 | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced in House | |
2011-02-23 | Ordered to House | |
2011-02-23 | Effective July 1, 2011 (Roll No. 4) | |
2011-02-23 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) | |
2011-02-23 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-02-23 | On 3rd reading | |
2011-02-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-02-22 | On 2nd reading | |
2011-02-21 | Read 1st time | |
2011-02-21 | On 1st reading | |
2011-02-18 | Committee substitute reported | |
2011-02-09 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced in Senate | |
2011-02-09 | To Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for introduction |