WV SB473 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-22 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring insurance coverage for the prescription drug Varenicline
Title
Requiring insurance coverage for the prescription drug Varenicline
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Richard Ojeda [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Stephen Baldwin [D] |
Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 118) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | To House Finance |
2018-02-22 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2018-02-15 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-15 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Finance |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 118) |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-14 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-13 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-02 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 15 | 4p | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 16 | 3bb | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 24 | 7q | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25 | 8n | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 25A | 8p | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 16 | 7b | New Code | See Bill Text |
9 | 5 | 20a | New Code | See Bill Text |