WV SB470 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-02 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to revise current law as it relates to access to adoption records by adoptees in order to make such records accessible for medical purposes. The bill authorizes adult adoptees access to certain records. The bill requires birth parents to provide certain health information at time of adoption. The bill allows birth parents to designate a contact. The bill directs the Department of Health and Human Resources to administer collection of records, require additional information and charge a reasonable fee for records copies. The bill provides a procedure for collection and dissemination of information. The bill authorizes the Department of Health and Human Resources to promulgate legislative rules needed to administer the program.
Title
Making adoption records accessible for medical purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 331) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-02 | House | To House Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | House | To Judiciary |
2023-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 331) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading with right to amend |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported do pass, with amendment and title amendment |
2023-02-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading to Judiciary |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2023-02-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, without recommendation |
2023-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-25 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 22 | 803 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 4 | 604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 607 | Amended Code | Citation Text |