WV SB470 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-10 - Approved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Limiting release of certain personal information maintained by state agencies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting release of certain personal information maintained by state agencies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 640) (Y: 60 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 639) (Y: 53 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 464) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 550) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 242) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-10HouseApproved by Governor 4/28/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateApproved by Governor 4/28/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-28SenateApproved by Governor 4/28/21
2021-04-10HouseTo Governor 4/16/21 - House Journal
2021-04-10SenateTo Governor 4/16/21 - Senate Journal
2021-04-16SenateTo Governor 4/16/21
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-10HouseCompleted legislative action
2021-04-10HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-10HousePassed House (Roll No. 640)
2021-04-10HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment (Roll No. 639)
2021-04-10HouseHouse received Senate message
2021-04-10SenateSenate requests House to concur
2021-04-10SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 464)
2021-04-10SenateHouse Message received
2021-04-09HouseCommunicated to Senate
2021-04-09HousePassed House (Roll No. 550)
2021-04-09HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-09HouseAmendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-09HouseAmendment withdrawn (Voice vote)
2021-04-09HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-09HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2021-04-09HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2021-04-09HouseOn 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar
2021-04-08HouseAmendment pending
2021-04-08HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-08HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-07HouseRead 1st time
2021-04-07HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2021-04-06HouseWith amendment, do pass
2021-03-31HouseTo House Judiciary
2021-03-31HouseTo Judiciary
2021-03-31HouseIntroduced in House
2021-03-30SenateOrdered to House
2021-03-30SenatePassed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 242)
2021-03-30SenateRead 3rd time
2021-03-30SenateOn 3rd reading
2021-03-29SenateRead 2nd time
2021-03-29SenateOn 2nd reading
2021-03-27SenateRead 1st time
2021-03-27SenateImmediate consideration
2021-03-27SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Judiciary
2021-03-24SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary
2021-02-26SenateTo Government Organization
2021-02-26SenateIntroduced in Senate
2021-02-26SenateTo Government Organization
2021-02-26SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5A821Amended CodeCitation Text
5A822Amended CodeCitation Text
5A824New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=470&year=2021&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB470%20INTR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=470
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB470%20SUB1.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=470
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB470%20SUB2.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=470
Texthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB470%20SUB2%20ENR.htm&yr=2021&sesstype=RS&i=470
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB470%20SFAT%20TRUMP%203-29.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB470%20H%20JUD%20AM%20_3.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB470%20H%20JUD%20AM%20_2.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/com_amends/SB470%20H%20JUD%20AM%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB470%20HFA%20CAPITO%204-8%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB470%20SFAT%20TAKUBO%204-10.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB470%20SFA%20TAKUBO%204-10%20_1.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/chamber/2021/RS/floor_amends/SB470%20SFA%20TAKUBO%204-10%20_1%20adopted.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/03-30-0242.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00550.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/senate/04-10-0464.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00639.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/legisdocs/2021/RS/votes/house/00640.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback