WV SB47 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Creating Charter Schools Stimulus Fund
Title
Creating Charter Schools Stimulus Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 636) (Y: 62 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 169) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 169) (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | Senate | Chapter 124, Acts, Regular Session, 2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/23 |
2023-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 - Senate Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | To Governor 3/16/2023 |
2023-03-11 | House | To Governor 3/16/2023 - House Journal |
2023-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2023-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2023-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2023-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 636) |
2023-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2023-03-08 | House | Immediate consideration |
2023-03-08 | House | Do pass |
2023-03-06 | House | To House Finance |
2023-03-06 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2023-02-14 | House | To House Education |
2023-02-14 | House | To Education then Finance |
2023-02-14 | House | Introduced in House |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 169) |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2023-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2023-01-26 | Senate | To Finance |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To School Choice |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | To School Choice then Finance |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Filed for introduction |