WV SB469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-30 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting waste of game animals, birds or fish
Title
Prohibiting waste of game animals, birds or fish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 267) (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 267) |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Committee substitute for committee substitute reported |
2017-03-07 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-28 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2662 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - To House Judiciary