WV SB462 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-15 - Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to extend from three weeks to a reasonable time after the close of the public comment period the time in which the Department of Environmental Protection must hold an informal conference on a surface-mining permit application and extends from 30 days to 60 days from the informal conference the time in which the secretary must issue or deny a surface-mining permit.
Title
Extending time for informal conferences on surface mining permit applications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 260) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | Senate | Chapter 130, Acts, Regular Session, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/29/13 |
2013-04-17 | House | To Governor 4/25/13 - House Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 - Senate Journal |
2013-04-25 | Senate | To Governor 4/25/13 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2013-04-11 | House | Completed legislative action |
2013-04-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 260) |
2013-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2013-04-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2013-04-09 | House | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar |
2013-04-08 | House | Do pass |
2013-04-05 | House | To House Judiciary |
2013-04-05 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business |
2013-04-02 | House | To Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business then Judiciary |
2013-04-02 | House | Introduced in House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 11) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-03-29 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2013-03-28 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Energy, Industry and Mining then Judiciary |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2862 (Same As) 2013-03-07 - To House Energy, Industry and Labor, Economic Development and Small Business
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 3 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 3 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |