WV SB456 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 25, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 25, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The provisions of Senate Bill No. 329 enacted during the 2016 Regular Legislative Session inadvertently separated the phrase “or to the other parent of his or her children” from its original clause. The purpose of this bill is to restore the language to the original clause.
Title
Relating to standards for termination of parental rights in child abuse and neglect cases
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-01 - House - Effective from passage (Roll No. 305) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 304) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 69) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 304) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Effective from passage (Roll No. 69) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 25, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-01 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-01 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-01 | House | Effective from passage (Roll No. 305) |
2017-04-01 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 304) |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Effective from passage (Roll No. 69) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 69) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2732 (Similar To) 2017-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 4 | 605 | Amended Code | Citation Text |