WV SB454 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to define the owner of a dam for purposes of the Dam Control Act.
Title
Defining dam "owner"
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] | Sen. Donald Cookman [D] | Sen. Daniel Hall [D] | Sen. William Laird [D] |
Sen. Gregory Tucker [D] | Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Herb Snyder [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-08 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 455) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 331) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 13) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 331) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Chapter 64, Acts, Regular Session, 2014 |
2014-03-14 | House | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/26/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | To Governor 3/21/14 - House Journal |
2014-03-14 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 - Senate Journal |
2014-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/14 |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-08 | House | Completed legislative action |
2014-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 455) |
2014-03-08 | House | House received Senate message |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2014-03-08 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 13) |
2014-03-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2014-03-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2014-03-07 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 331) |
2014-03-07 | House | Read 3rd time |
2014-03-07 | House | On 3rd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-06 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2014-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2014-03-06 | House | On 2nd reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-05 | House | Read 1st time |
2014-03-05 | House | On 1st reading, Daily Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2014-02-28 | House | To House Judiciary |
2014-02-28 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2014-02-12 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced in House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 4) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2014-02-11 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2014-02-10 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2014-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2014-02-04 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2014-01-30 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2014-01-30 | Senate | To Agriculture and Rural Development then Judiciary |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 14 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |