WV SB453 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to background checks of certain financial institutions

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to background checks of certain financial institutions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 294) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 395) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 101) (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 38, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-08SenateTo Governor 3/8/19
2019-03-08HouseTo Governor 3/8/19 - House Journal
2019-03-02HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-01SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-01SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-01SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 294)
2019-03-01SenateHouse Message received
2019-02-28HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-02-28HousePassed House (Roll No. 395)
2019-02-28HouseRead 3rd time
2019-02-28HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-27HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-02-27HouseRead 2nd time
2019-02-27HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-26HouseRead 1st time
2019-02-26HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-25HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-15HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-15HouseWith amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseTo House Banking and Insurance
2019-02-11HouseTo Banking and Insurance then Judiciary
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-08SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-08SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 101)
2019-02-08SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-08SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-07SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-07SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-06SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-06SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-05SenateReported do pass
2019-01-29SenateTo Banking and Insurance
2019-01-29SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-29SenateTo Banking and Insurance
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2621 (Similar To) 2019-02-11 - To House Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31A24Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback