WV SB451 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB451

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Chapter 168, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting Sunday hunting on public lands

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating generally to hunting and fishing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 334) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 348) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 295) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-03 - House - Motion to amend bill on 3rd reading adopted (Roll No. 294) (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 288) (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 156) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-23SenateChapter 168, Acts, Regular Session, 2018
2018-03-10HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - House Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/18
2018-03-10HouseTo Governor 3/14/18 - House Journal
2018-03-10SenateTo Governor 3/14/18 - Senate Journal
2018-03-14SenateTo Governor 3/14/18
2018-03-07SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-06HouseCompleted legislative action
2018-03-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-06HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 334)
2018-03-06HouseHouse received Senate message
2018-03-05SenateSenate requests House to concur
2018-03-05SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 348)
2018-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2018-03-03HouseCommunicated to Senate
2018-03-03HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-03HousePassed House (Roll No. 295)
2018-03-03HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-03HouseAmended on 3rd reading
2018-03-03HouseAmendment reported by the Clerk
2018-03-03HouseMotion to amend bill on 3rd reading adopted (Roll No. 294)
2018-03-03HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-03HouseHouse reconsidered its action
2018-03-02HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2018-03-02HousePassed House (Roll No. 288)
2018-03-02HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-02HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2018-03-01HouseRead 2nd time
2018-03-01HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-28HouseRead 1st time
2018-02-28HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2018-02-27House2nd reference dispensed
2018-02-27HouseDo pass
2018-02-21HouseTo House Agriculture and Natural Resources
2018-02-21HouseTo Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary
2018-02-21HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-20SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 156)
2018-02-20SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-19SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-19SenateOn 2nd reading
2018-02-16SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-16SenateOn 1st reading
2018-02-15SenateCommittee substitute reported
2018-02-06SenateTo Judiciary
2018-02-06SenateReported do pass, but first to Judiciary
2018-02-01SenateTo Natural Resources
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-02-01SenateTo Natural Resources then Judiciary
2018-02-01SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB451 (Carry Over) 2017-02-27 - To Judiciary
HB3020 (Similar To) 2018-02-08 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2025Amended CodeCitation Text
2079Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.wvlegislature.gov/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=451&year=2018&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB451%20INTR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=451
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB451%20SUB1.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=451
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB451%20SUB1%20ENR.htm&yr=2018&sesstype=RS&i=451
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/02-20-0156.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00288.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00294.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00295.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/senate/03-05-0348.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2018/RS/votes/house/00334.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback