WV SB448 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - To House Government Organization
Pending: House Government Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to professional associations
Title
Relating generally to professional associations
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-28 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 238) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-02-01 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 9B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 9B | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |