WV SB445 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Referred to Rules on 1st reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Referred to Rules on 1st reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to repeal outdated provisions of code relating to West Virginia Graduate College and Marshall University.
Title
Repealing outdated section of WV code relating to WV Graduate College and Marshall University
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 1st reading |
2023-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Education |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2023-01-23 | Senate | To Education |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2835 (Similar To) 2023-05-01 - Chapter 71, Acts, Regular Session, 2023
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 1 | 8b | Repealed Code | Citation Text |