WV SB445 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Modifying police and firemen's pension plans for trustees
Title
Modifying police and firemen's pension plans for trustees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 162) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 90) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 90) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 66, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Approved by Governor 3/1/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/1/2022 |
2022-02-24 | House | To Governor 2/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-23 | Senate | To Governor 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-21 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-18 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-18 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-18 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 162) |
2022-02-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do pass |
2022-02-10 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-10 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 90) |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-07 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4432 (Similar To) 2022-02-08 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |