WV SB443 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Including police and firefighter as electors of trustees for certain pension funds
Title
Including police and firefighter as electors of trustees for certain pension funds
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 478) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 140) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 140) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 65, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/15/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-11 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-10 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 478) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-08 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-07 | House | Do pass |
2022-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2022-03-01 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2022-02-17 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 140) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
8 | 22 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |