WV SB442 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-11 - Communicated to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to WV Public Employee Retirement System
Title
Relating to WV Public Employee Retirement System
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Charles Clements [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Bill Hamilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 565) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 139) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 139) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 565) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-03-01 | House | To House Finance |
2022-03-01 | House | Do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | To House Pensions and Retirement |
2022-02-17 | House | To Pensions and Retirement then Finance |
2022-02-17 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 139) |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-15 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-14 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-01-27 | Senate | To Finance |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Pensions |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Pensions then Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 10 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 10 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |