WV SB442 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to modify definitions of “assault” and "battery", and “domestic assault” and "domestic battery" to conform with federal laws relating to firearms possession criminal offenses.
Title
Relating generally to crimes against persons
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 283) (Y: 96 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 50, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/11/17 |
2017-04-07 | House | To Governor 4/6/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-06 | Senate | To Governor 4/6/17 |
2017-04-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-03-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 283) |
2017-03-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-29 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Do pass |
2017-03-08 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | To Judiciary |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 68) |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-07 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-27 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 2 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 2 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |