WV SB441 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to higher education campus police officers
Title
Relating to higher education campus police officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 426) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 219) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 219) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 134, Acts, Regular Session, 2019 |
2019-03-09 | House | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/22/19 |
2019-03-09 | House | To Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal |
2019-03-09 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal |
2019-03-11 | Senate | To Governor 3/11/19 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | House Message received |
2019-03-04 | House | Completed legislative action |
2019-03-04 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 426) |
2019-03-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-03-04 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-02 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-03-02 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2019-03-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2019-03-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | To House Education |
2019-02-26 | House | To Education |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 219) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-28 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2513 (Similar To) 2019-01-18 - To House Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18B | 4 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |