WV SB441 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-09 - Vetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

The purpose of this bill is to establish the municipal home rule pilot program as a permanent program, allow all municipalities to participate in the program, and allow municipalities who institute a sales and use tax pursuant to the program to administer and collect the tax through their own municipal collector’s offices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing Municipal Home Rule Pilot Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 565) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 564) (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-08 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 494) (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 412) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 89) (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-09SenateVetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - Senate Journal
2017-04-26SenateVetoed by Governor 4/26//17
2017-04-09HouseVetoed by Governor 4/26/17 - House Journal
2017-04-09HouseTo Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal
2017-04-09SenateTo Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal
2017-04-20SenateTo Governor 4/20/17
2017-04-08SenateHouse Message received
2017-04-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2017-04-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-04-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 565)
2017-04-08HouseHouse reconsidered passage (Voice)
2017-04-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 564)
2017-04-08HouseHouse concurred in Senate title amendment
2017-04-08HouseHouse received Senate message
2017-04-08SenateSenate requests House to concur
2017-04-08SenateSenate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 494)
2017-04-08SenateAmendment not germane
2017-04-08SenatePoint of Order
2017-04-08SenateFerns moves to amend bill
2017-04-08SenateDeferred until foot of House messages
2017-04-08SenateAmendment not germane
2017-04-08SenatePoint of Order
2017-04-08SenateMotion to amend House amendment
2017-04-08SenateHouse Message received
2017-04-06HouseCommunicated to Senate
2017-04-06HousePassed House (Roll No. 412)
2017-04-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-04-06HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2017-04-05HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2017-04-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-04-05HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2017-04-04HouseRead 1st time
2017-04-04HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2017-04-03House2nd reference dispensed
2017-04-03HouseWith amendment, do pass
2017-03-13HouseTo House Government Organization
2017-03-13HouseTo Government Organization then Finance
2017-03-13HouseIntroduced in House
2017-03-11SenateOrdered to House
2017-03-11SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 89)
2017-03-11SenateRead 3rd time
2017-03-11SenateOn 3rd reading
2017-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2017-03-10SenateOn 2nd reading
2017-03-09SenateRead 1st time
2017-03-09SenateOn 1st reading
2017-03-08SenateCommittee substitute reported
2017-02-24SenateTo Government Organization
2017-02-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2017-02-24SenateTo Government Organization
2017-02-24SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2307 (Similar To) 2017-02-09 - To House Government Organization

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
815aAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=441&year=2017&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=sb441%20intr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=441
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB441%20SUB1.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=441
Texthttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/bills_text.cfm?billdoc=SB441%20SUB1%20enr.htm&yr=2017&sesstype=RS&i=441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/senate/03-11-0089.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00412.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/senate/04-08-0494.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00564.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.wv.us/legisdocs/2017/RS/votes/house/00565.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback