WV SB438 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to WV Security for Public Deposits Act
Title
Relating generally to WV Security for Public Deposits Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 488) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 564) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 564) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-02-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 236, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | Approved by Governor 3/30/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-12 | House | To Governor 3/17/22 - House Journal |
2022-03-12 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-03-17 | Senate | To Governor 3/17/2022 |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2022-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 488) |
2022-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 564) |
2022-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | To House Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | To Finance |
2022-02-21 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 1st reading |
2022-02-09 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-02-08 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-20 | Senate | To Banking and Insurance then Finance |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4271 (Similar To) 2022-01-27 - To House Finance
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 1 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
12 | 1B | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 1B | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |