WV SB436 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Correcting code citation for authority of State Fire Marshal
Title
Correcting code citation for authority of State Fire Marshal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 91) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 192, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-02-21 | House | Approved by Governor 2/18/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 2/18/2022 |
2022-02-16 | House | To Governor 2/14/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-14 | Senate | To Governor 2/14/2022 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-02-09 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-02-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 91) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-02-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-02-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-02-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-02-03 | House | Do pass |
2022-01-27 | House | To House Government Organization |
2022-01-27 | House | To Government Organization |
2022-01-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 51) |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-01-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-19 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4368 (Similar To) 2022-01-25 - To House Government Organization
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |