WV SB431 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating generally to Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Title
Relating generally to Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | To House Judiciary |
2022-02-17 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | House | To House Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse |
2022-01-31 | House | To Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse then Judiciary |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 55) |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-27 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-01-26 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2022-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-19 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
60A | 4 | 416 | Amended Code | Citation Text |