WV SB431 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-24 - Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to school attendance notification requirements to DMV
Title
Relating to school attendance notification requirements to DMV
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Weld [R] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-26 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 291) (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-24 | Senate | Chapter 184, Acts, Regular Session, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/7/21 |
2021-04-01 | House | To Governor 4/1/21 - House Journal |
2021-04-01 | Senate | To Governor 4/1/21 |
2021-03-27 | Senate | House Message received |
2021-03-26 | House | Completed legislative action |
2021-03-26 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2021-03-26 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 291) |
2021-03-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-26 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-24 | House | Read 1st time |
2021-03-24 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2021-03-23 | House | Do pass |
2021-03-18 | House | To House Education |
2021-03-18 | House | To Education |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 141) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-15 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-23 | Senate | To Education |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | To Education |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 8 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |