WV SB431 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing pharmacists and pharmacy interns dispense opioid antagonists
Title
Authorizing pharmacists and pharmacy interns dispense opioid antagonists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-12 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 449) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 515) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 149) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 515) (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 149) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 205, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/29/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/29/2016 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-28 | Senate | To Governor 3/28/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/28/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-12 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 449) |
2016-03-12 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-11 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-11 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 515) |
2016-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-11 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-10 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-10 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-22 | House | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-02-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 149) |
2016-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-20 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-19 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-01-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-29 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4335 (Similar To) 2016-01-29 - To House Select Committee on Prevention and Treatment of Substance Abuse
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 46 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 46 | 3a | New Code | See Bill Text |
16 | 46 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 46 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |