WV SB43 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifying means of posting to prohibit hunting or trespassing
Title
Clarifying means of posting to prohibit hunting or trespassing
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Williams [D] | Sen. Robert Beach [D] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] | Sen. Kent Leonhardt [R] |
Sen. Ronald Miller [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 370) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 439) (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 71) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 439) (Y: 81 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 71) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 59, Acts, Regular Session, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/23/16 |
2016-03-15 | House | To Governor 3/22/16 - House Journal |
2016-03-15 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 - Senate Journal |
2016-03-22 | Senate | To Governor 3/22/16 |
2016-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 370) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2016-03-09 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 439) |
2016-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-03-09 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2016-03-08 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2016-03-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-03-08 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-07 | House | Read 1st time |
2016-03-07 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2016-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2016-03-03 | House | To House Judiciary |
2016-03-03 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | To House Agriculture and Natural Resources |
2016-02-10 | House | To Agriculture and Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced in House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 71) |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-09 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-08 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2016-02-06 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2016-02-06 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2016-01-21 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Natural Resources |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2016-01-13 | Senate | To Natural Resources then Judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
61 | 3B | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |