WV SB422 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-22 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing common law "veil piercing" claims not be used to impose personal liability
Title
Establishing common law "veil piercing" claims not be used to impose personal liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | House | To Judiciary |
2021-03-22 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 152) |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-19 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-03-17 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2021-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2021-02-23 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
31B | 3 | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |