WV SB421 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committed to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-29 - Committed to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to increase from $200 million to $500 million the amount the Division of Highways is allowed to use to apply for Federal Grant Anticipation Notes to be reimbursed from the funds made available to West Virginia from the federal government’s Highway Fund for West Virginia. Funds obtained from this federal grant will only be used for the completion of interstate or other highway facilities designated as part of the federal-aid highway system or for toll bridges.
Title
Increasing amount of authorized federal Grant Anticipation Notes for which DOH may apply
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Committed to Rules on 3rd reading |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/28/17 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-25 | Senate | Laid over on 2nd reading 3/25/17 |
2017-03-25 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2017-03-22 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Reported do pass, but first to Finance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Transportation and Infrastructure then Finance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2878 (Similar To) 2017-05-23 - Chapter 219, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 17A | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
27 | 5 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
27 | 5 | 2a | New Code | See Bill Text |