WV SB42 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB42

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting faith-based electives in classroom drug prevention programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting faith-based electives in classroom drug prevention programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 9) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21HouseTo House Education
2020-01-21HouseTo Education
2020-01-21HouseIntroduced in House
2020-01-20SenateOrdered to House
2020-01-20SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 9)
2020-01-20SenateRead 3rd time
2020-01-20SenateOn 3rd reading
2020-01-17SenateRead 2nd time
2020-01-17SenateOn 2nd reading
2020-01-16SenateRead 1st time
2020-01-16SenateOn 1st reading
2020-01-15SenateReported do pass
2020-01-08SenateTo Education
2020-01-08SenateIntroduced in Senate
2020-01-08SenateTo Education
2020-01-08SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB42 (Carry Over) 2019-01-09 - To Judiciary

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1827bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback