WV SB419 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB419

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing classification and base salaries of certain civilian employees of WV State Police Forensic Laboratory

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing classification and base salaries of certain civilian employees of WV State Police Forensic Laboratory

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 233) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-02HouseTo House Finance
2018-03-02HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2018-02-28HouseTo House Government Organization
2018-02-28HouseTo Government Organization then Finance
2018-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2018-02-28SenateOrdered to House
2018-02-28SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 233)
2018-02-28SenateRead 3rd time
2018-02-28SenateOn 3rd reading
2018-02-27SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-27SenateReported do pass
2018-02-27SenateHaving been read 1st time 2/23/18
2018-02-23SenateOn 2nd reading to Finance
2018-02-23SenateRead 1st time
2018-02-23SenateImmediate consideration
2018-02-23SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2018-01-30SenateTo Government Organization
2018-01-30SenateIntroduced in Senate
2018-01-30SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2018-01-30SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB419 (Carry Over) 2017-05-23 - Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2017

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1525Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback