WV SB419 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the creation of special revenue accounts in the State Treasury for the deposit of Division of Labor fees, and to authorize the commissioner utilize excess funds in new and existing special revenue accounts to meet the division’s funding obligations when necessary. This bill specifically authorizes the division to charge fees for the registration of service persons, service agencies, and businesses that use weighing and measuring devices for commercial purposes, authorizes the commissioner to promulgate an emergency legislative rule regarding such fees, and authorizes the division to deposit such fees and certain other fees in the Weights and Measures Fund. This bill authorizes the increase of permitting fees for sterilizers and the increase of registration fees for bedding manufacturers, upholsterers and renovators.
Title
Creating special revenue fund sources for Division of Labor to meet statutory obligations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-07 - House - House receded and passed (Roll No. 510) (Y: 96 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 269) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 195) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 269) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 195) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 135, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/25/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | To Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-08 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-07 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-07 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-07 | House | House receded and passed (Roll No. 510) |
2017-04-07 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede (Voice vote) |
2017-04-03 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-03-30 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-03-30 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 269) |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-30 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-29 | House | Amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Special Calender |
2017-03-29 | House | On 2nd reading, House Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | From Special Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on House Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-25 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-03-25 | House | Immediate consideration |
2017-03-25 | House | Reference dispensed |
2017-03-25 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 195) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-24 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-23 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-23 | Senate | To Finance |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2776 (Similar To) 2017-03-29 - Tabled on 3rd reading, Special Calendar
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 11 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 14 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 15 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 16 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 3 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 3C | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 3D | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 5 | 5c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
21 | 9 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1 | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1A | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 1A | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |