WV SB415 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Timber Cotenancy Modernization and Majority Protection Act and Unknown and Unlocatable Timber Interest Owners Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Timber Cotenancy Modernization and Majority Protection Act and Unknown and Unlocatable Timber Interest Owners Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Motion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 201) (Y: 15 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Senate rejects effective date (Roll No. 200) (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 199) (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-25HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-23SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-23SenateMotion to reconsider rejected (Roll No. 201)
2019-02-23SenateSenate rejects effective date (Roll No. 200)
2019-02-23SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 199)
2019-02-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-24SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-24SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
37D11New CodeSee Bill Text
37D12New CodeSee Bill Text
37D13New CodeSee Bill Text
37D14New CodeSee Bill Text
37D15New CodeSee Bill Text
37D16New CodeSee Bill Text
37D17New CodeSee Bill Text
37D21New CodeSee Bill Text
37D22New CodeSee Bill Text
37D23New CodeSee Bill Text
37D24New CodeSee Bill Text
37D25New CodeSee Bill Text
37D26New CodeSee Bill Text
37D27New CodeSee Bill Text
37D28New CodeSee Bill Text
37D29New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback