WV SB414 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating Protect Our Right to Unite Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating Protect Our Right to Unite Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 267) (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 267)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateImmediate consideration
2019-02-25SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-24SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-24SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-24SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
171New CodeSee Bill Text
172New CodeSee Bill Text
173New CodeSee Bill Text
174New CodeSee Bill Text
20227Amended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback