WV SB412 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Referred to Rules on 3rd reading
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Katherine Johnson Fair Pay Act of 2019
Title
Establishing Katherine Johnson Fair Pay Act of 2019
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules on 3rd reading |
2019-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Floor amendment rejected (Voice vote) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2019-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2019-02-23 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2019-01-24 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2308 (Similar To) 2019-01-11 - To House Industry and Labor
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 11 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 11 | 9b | New Code | See Bill Text |