WV SB408 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor 4/3/12 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-16 - Vetoed by Governor 4/3/12 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to provide criminal penalties for the intentional defacement of public and private property due to graffiti and provide a civil remedy for victims.
Title
Relating to crimes against property involving graffiti
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-10 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 1) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 316) (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 4/3/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-04-03 | Vetoed by Governor 4/3/12 | |
2012-03-16 | Vetoed by Governor 4/3/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - House Journal | |
2012-03-16 | To Governor 3/29/12 - Senate Journal | |
2012-03-29 | To Governor 3/29/12 | |
2012-03-10 | Completed legislative action | |
2012-03-10 | House received Senate message | |
2012-03-10 | Communicated to House | |
2012-03-10 | Senate concurred in House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 1) | |
2012-03-10 | House Message received | |
2012-03-09 | Communicated to Senate | |
2012-03-09 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-09 | Passed House (Roll No. 316) | |
2012-03-09 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-03-09 | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-08 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2012-03-08 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-03-08 | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar | |
2012-03-07 | Read 1st time | |
2012-03-07 | From House Calendar, 1st reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2012-03-06 | With amendment, do pass | |
2012-02-16 | To House Finance | |
2012-02-16 | To Finance | |
2012-02-16 | Introduced in House | |
2012-02-15 | Ordered to House | |
2012-02-15 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) | |
2012-02-15 | Read 3rd time | |
2012-02-15 | On 3rd reading | |
2012-02-14 | Read 2nd time | |
2012-02-14 | On 2nd reading | |
2012-02-13 | Read 1st time | |
2012-02-13 | On 1st reading | |
2012-02-13 | Committee substitute reported | |
2012-01-24 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate | |
2012-01-25 | To Judiciary | |
2012-01-24 | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4052 (Same As) 2012-02-15 - To House Finance