WV SB400 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-27 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting state licensing boards from hiring lobbyists
Title
Prohibiting state licensing boards from hiring lobbyists
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Maynard [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Sue Cline [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-05 - Senate - Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 65) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2018-02-27 | House | Do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-06 | House | To Government Organization then Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Passed Senate with amended title (Roll No. 65) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-05 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-02 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Reported do pass, with title amendment |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-26 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB4297 (Similar To) 2018-01-25 - To House Government Organization