WV SB4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing ban on construction of nuclear power plants
Title
Repealing ban on construction of nuclear power plants
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Takubo [R] | Sen. Eric Nelson [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Richard Lindsay [D] |
Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] | Sen. Jack Woodrum [R] | Sen. Robert Karnes [R] | Sen. Robert Plymale [D] |
Sen. Rollan Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-31 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 55) (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 45) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 45) (Y: 24 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Senate | Chapter 53, Acts, Regular Session, 2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Approved by Governor 2/8/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 02/08/2022 - Senate Journal |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Approved by Governor 02/08/2022 |
2022-02-03 | House | To Governor 2/2/22 - House Journal |
2022-02-02 | Senate | To Governor 02/02/2022 |
2022-02-01 | Senate | House Message received |
2022-01-31 | House | Completed legislative action |
2022-01-31 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2022-01-31 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 55) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-31 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-28 | House | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-28 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-27 | House | Read 1st time |
2022-01-27 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2022-01-26 | House | Reference dispensed |
2022-01-26 | House | Immediate consideration |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 45) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2022-01-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2022-01-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2022-01-21 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2022-01-21 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2022-01-12 | Senate | To Economic Development |
2022-01-12 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 27A | 1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
16 | 27A | 2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |