WV SB4 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing licensed professionals donate time to care of indigent and needy in clinical setting
Title
Allowing licensed professionals donate time to care of indigent and needy in clinical setting
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Gaunch [R] | Sen. Charles Trump [R] | Sen. Gregory Boso [R] | Sen. Craig Blair [R] |
Sen. Patricia Rucker [R] | Sen. Glenn Jeffries [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] | Sen. Mike Woelfel [D] |
Sen. Dave Sypolt [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-06 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 463) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 392) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 392) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 376) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Chapter 171, Acts, Regular Session, 2017 |
2017-04-09 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/20/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/20/17 |
2017-04-09 | House | Approved by Governor 4/20/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | House | To Governor 4/13/17 - House Journal |
2017-04-09 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 - Senate Journal |
2017-04-13 | Senate | To Governor 4/13/17 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-06 | House | Completed legislative action |
2017-04-06 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-06 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 463) |
2017-04-06 | House | House received Senate message |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 392) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | House Message received |
2017-04-05 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-05 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 376) |
2017-04-05 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-05 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-04-04 | House | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) |
2017-04-04 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-04 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Postponed on 2nd reading, Special Calendar, until 4/4/17 |
2017-04-03 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2017-04-01 | House | Read 1st time |
2017-04-01 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2017-03-31 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2017-03-15 | House | To House Judiciary |
2017-03-15 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | House | To House Health and Human Resources |
2017-03-06 | House | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 47) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Floor amendments adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Unanimous consent to amend |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/2/17 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Laid over on 3rd reading 3/1/17 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2017-02-24 | Senate | 2nd reference dispensed |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported, but first to Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2017-02-08 | Senate | To Health and Human Resources then Judiciary |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2692 (Similar To) 2017-02-24 - To House Health and Human Resources
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 1 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 14 | 12b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 16 | 7a | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 20 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 21 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 28 | 8a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 10a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3E | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 4 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 7 | 6b | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 7A | 6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 8 | 16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |