WV SB396 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - To House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing limitations on nuisance actions against fire department or EMS fixed sirens
Title
Providing limitations on nuisance actions against fire department or EMS fixed sirens
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | To House Judiciary |
2021-03-18 | House | With amendment, do pass, but first to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | House | To House Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services |
2021-02-26 | House | To Fire Departments and Emergency Medical Services then Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 39) |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-02-25 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2021-02-23 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported do pass |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Originating in Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 12A | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |