WV SB396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Waiving occupational licensing fees for low-income individuals, military families, and young workers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Waiving occupational licensing fees for low-income individuals and military families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 596) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 266) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 187, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-25SenateApproved by Governor 3/25/19
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/22/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/22/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-22SenateTo Governor 3/22/19
2019-03-09SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-08HouseCompleted legislative action
2019-03-08HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-08HousePassed House (Roll No. 596)
2019-03-08HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-08HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-07HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-07HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-06HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-06HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-05HouseDo pass
2019-03-04HouseTo House Finance
2019-03-04HouseDo pass, but first to Finance
2019-02-28HouseTo House Government Organization
2019-02-28HouseTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 266)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateImmediate consideration
2019-02-25SenateReported do pass
2019-02-20SenateTo Finance
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-23SenateTo Government Organization
2019-01-23SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-23SenateTo Government Organization then Finance
2019-01-23SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30122New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback