WV SB393 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 7, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Protecting right to farm

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protecting right to farm

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 340) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 425) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 140) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateChapter 7, Acts, Regular Session, 2019
2019-03-09SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-27SenateApproved by Governor 3/27/19
2019-03-09HouseApproved by Governor 3/27/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09HouseTo Governor 3/11/19 - House Journal
2019-03-09SenateTo Governor 3/11/19 - Senate Journal
2019-03-11SenateTo Governor 3/11/19
2019-03-05HouseHouse received Senate message
2019-03-05SenateCompleted legislative action
2019-03-05SenateCommunicated to House
2019-03-05SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 340)
2019-03-05SenateHouse Message received
2019-03-04HouseCommunicated to Senate
2019-03-04HouseTitle amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-04HousePassed House (Roll No. 425)
2019-03-04HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-04HouseOn 3rd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-02HouseCommittee amendment adopted (Voice vote)
2019-03-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-02HouseOn 2nd reading, Special Calendar
2019-03-01HouseRead 1st time
2019-03-01HouseOn 1st reading, Special Calendar
2019-02-28HouseWith amendment, do pass
2019-02-18HouseTo House Judiciary
2019-02-18HouseTo Judiciary
2019-02-18HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-15SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-15SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 140)
2019-02-15SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-15SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-14SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-14SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-13SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-13SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-12SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-22SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-22SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-22SenateTo Judiciary
2019-01-22SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB2774 (Similar To) 2019-02-13 - To House Judiciary
HB2900 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - To House Agriculture and Natural Resources

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19192Amended CodeCitation Text
19197New CodeSee Bill Text
19198New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback