WV SB393 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to reform the juvenile justice system in West Virginia.
Title
Reforming juvenile justice system
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-14 - House - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 614) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 513) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - House - House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-14 - Senate - Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 6) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 513) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 512) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 150, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 4/2/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/27/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-27 | Senate | To Governor 3/27/15 |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-14 | House | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-14 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-14 | House | Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 614) |
2015-03-14 | House | House concurred in Senate amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 613) |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 6) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | Senate amends House amendment and passed bill (Roll No. 6) |
2015-03-14 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 513) |
2015-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 512) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-13 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-12 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2015-03-12 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-12 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | 2nd reference dispensed |
2015-03-10 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-27 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-27 | House | To Judiciary then Finance |
2015-02-27 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Effective May 17, 2015 (Roll No. 8) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 8) |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-27 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-25 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2641 (Same As) 2015-02-06 - To House Judiciary
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 15A | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
22 | 15A | 22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 1 | 206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 1 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 2 | 1002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 2 | 1003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 2 | 907 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 2 | 912 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 2 | 913 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 4 | 403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 406 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 409 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 413 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 4 | 702 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 702a | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 4 | 711 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 712 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 714 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 718 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 4 | 724 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 4 | 725 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5 | 103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 11a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 13a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 13h | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5 | 13i | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5 | 2a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5B | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5B | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5D | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5D | 3c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5E | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 5E | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 5E | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |