WV SB392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Reconfiguring Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council
Title
Reconfiguring membership of Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-10 - House - House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 551) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 523) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 405) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-10 - Senate - Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 523) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 405) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor 3/28/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 - Senate Journal |
2018-03-21 | Senate | To Governor 3/21/18 |
2018-03-10 | House | To Governor 3/21/18 - House Journal |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Completed legislative action |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 551) |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report received-House |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate requests House to concur |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate adopted conference report and passed bill (Roll No. 523) |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Conference report filed - Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | Conference report filed - House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | To conference |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Senate agreed to conference and appoints conferees: Boso, Takubo, Jeffries |
2018-03-10 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-10 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-10 | House | House appointed conferees: Criss, Martin, Williams |
2018-03-10 | House | House refused to recede and requested conference(Voice vote) |
2018-03-10 | House | House received Senate message |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | House Message received |
2018-03-08 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 405) |
2018-03-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2018-03-08 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-07 | House | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) |
2018-03-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2018-03-07 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-06 | House | Read 1st time |
2018-03-06 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2018-03-05 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | To House Government Organization |
2018-02-13 | House | To Government Organization |
2018-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 97) |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | On 3rd reading |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2018-02-09 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2018-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2018-01-25 | Senate | To Government Organization |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 4C | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
16 | 4C | 6c | Repealed Code | Citation Text |