WV SB390 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-15 - Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to authorize the Public Service Commission to approve expedited cost recovery of natural gas utility infrastructure projects deemed just and reasonable and in the public interest. The bill makes findings. The bill establishes the application and hearing process. The bill provides for rule making.
Title
Authorizing PSC approve expedited cost recovery of natural gas utility infrastructure projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 8) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 469) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - House - Passed House (Roll No. 469) (Y: 94 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - Senate - Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 24) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | Senate | Chapter 198, Acts, Regular Session, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Approved by Governor 3/24/15 |
2015-03-18 | House | To Governor 3/23/15 - House Journal |
2015-03-18 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/15 - Senate Journal |
2015-03-23 | Senate | To Governor 3/23/15 |
2015-03-14 | House | House received Senate message |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Completed legislative action |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Communicated to House |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and passed bill (Roll No. 8) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | House Message received |
2015-03-13 | House | Communicated to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Passed House (Roll No. 469) |
2015-03-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-03-12 | House | Amended on 3rd reading |
2015-03-12 | House | Amendment reported by the Clerk |
2015-03-12 | House | On 3rd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment pending |
2015-03-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-11 | House | On 2nd reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Read 1st time |
2015-03-10 | House | On 1st reading, Special Calendar |
2015-03-09 | House | With amendment, do pass |
2015-02-20 | House | To House Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | To Judiciary |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced in House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Ordered to House |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Roll No. 25) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Suspension of Constitutional Rule (Roll No. 24) |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-02-20 | Senate | On 2nd reading |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Read 1st time |
2015-02-19 | Senate | On 1st reading |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Committee substitute reported |
2015-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate |
2015-02-03 | Senate | To Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB2743 (Same As) 2015-02-13 - To House Energy