WV SB383 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - To House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Creating WV Healthy Food Crop Block Grant Program

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creating WV Healthy Food Crop Block Grant Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 197) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25HouseTo House Finance
2019-02-25HouseTo Finance
2019-02-25HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-23SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-23SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 197)
2019-02-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-23SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-22SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-22SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-21SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-21SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-20SenateCommittee substitute for committee substitute reported
2019-02-15SenateTo Finance
2019-02-15SenateCommittee substitute reported, but first to Finance
2019-01-21SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-21SenateTo Agriculture and Rural Development then Finance
2019-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
19361New CodeSee Bill Text
19362New CodeSee Bill Text
19363New CodeSee Bill Text
19364New CodeSee Bill Text
19365New CodeSee Bill Text
19366New CodeSee Bill Text
19367New CodeSee Bill Text
19371New CodeSee Bill Text
19372New CodeSee Bill Text
19373New CodeSee Bill Text
19374New CodeSee Bill Text
19375New CodeSee Bill Text
19376New CodeSee Bill Text
19377New CodeSee Bill Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback