WV SB379 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-28 - To House Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Permitting county board of education to include faith-based electives in drug prevention programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permitting county board of education to include faith-based electives in drug prevention programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Roll No. 265) (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-28HouseTo House Education
2019-02-28HouseTo Education
2019-02-28HouseIntroduced in House
2019-02-27SenateOrdered to House
2019-02-27SenatePassed Senate (Roll No. 265)
2019-02-27SenateRead 3rd time
2019-02-27SenateOn 3rd reading
2019-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-02-26SenateOn 2nd reading
2019-02-25SenateRead 1st time
2019-02-25SenateOn 1st reading
2019-02-23SenateCommittee substitute reported
2019-01-21SenateTo Education
2019-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate
2019-01-21SenateTo Education
2019-01-21SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1827bAmended CodeCitation Text

West Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback