WV SB372 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-11 - Effective Date
Summary
The purpose of this bill is to update language in the West Virginia Medical Practice Act and provide current terminology.
Title
Updating language in WV Medical Practice Act
Sponsors
Sen. Larry Edgell [D] | Sen. Dan Foster [D] | Sen. Evan Jenkins [D] | Sen. Ron Stollings [D] |
Sen. John Unger [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-11 | Effective Date | |
2010-04-22 | Chapter 149, Acts, Regular Session, 2010 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-24 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 | |
2010-03-20 | Approved by Governor 3/24/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - Senate Journal | |
2010-03-23 | To Governor 3/23/10 | |
2010-03-20 | To Governor 3/23/10 - House Journal | |
2010-03-13 | Completed legislative action | |
2010-03-13 | House Message received | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | House receded and passed (Roll No. 411) | |
2010-03-13 | Senate requests House to concur | |
2010-03-13 | Senate refused to concur; requested House recede(Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Communicated to Senate | |
2010-03-13 | Title amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Passed House (Roll No. 350) | |
2010-03-13 | Committee amendment adopted (Voice vote) | |
2010-03-13 | Amendment to committee amendment adopted (voice) | |
2010-03-13 | On 3rd reading with right to amend, Special Calendar | |
2010-03-11 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-03-11 | From House Calendar, 2nd reading, placed on Special Calendar | |
2010-03-10 | Read 1st time | |
2010-03-10 | Immediate consideration | |
2010-03-10 | With amendment, do pass | |
2010-03-02 | To House Government Organization | |
2010-03-02 | With amendment, do pass, but first to Government Organization | |
2010-02-18 | To House Health and Human Resources | |
2010-02-18 | To Health and Human Resources then Government Organization | |
2010-02-18 | Introduced in House | |
2010-02-17 | Ordered to House | |
2010-02-17 | Passed Senate (Roll No. 1) | |
2010-02-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2010-02-17 | On 3rd reading | |
2010-02-16 | Read 2nd time | |
2010-02-16 | On 2nd reading | |
2010-02-15 | Read 1st time | |
2010-02-15 | On 1st reading | |
2010-02-12 | 2nd reference dispensed | |
2010-02-12 | Reported do pass, but first to Finance | |
2010-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources | |
2010-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources then Finance | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in Senate | |
2010-01-28 | To Health and Human Resources then Finance | |
2010-01-28 | Filed for introduction |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 3 | 18 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
30 | 3 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 3 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
West Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.wv.us/Bill_Status/Bills_history.cfm?input=372&year=2010&sessiontype=RS&btype=bill |